EP0702896 - Aqueuou thixotropic suspension of plant protection products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis CropScience GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/38] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states Aventis CropScience GmbH Miraustr. 54 13509 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states Hoechst Schering AgrEvo GmbH Miraustrasse 54 D-13509 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frisch, Gerhard, Dr. Westerwaldstrasse 7 D-61273 Wehrheim / DE | 02 /
Maier, Thomas, Dr. Kapellenstrasse 16 D-65719 Hofheim / DE | [1996/13] | Application number, filing date | 95113520.1 | 29.08.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | DE19944433653 | 21.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4433653 | [1996/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702896 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702896 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/04 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
A01N25/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/13] | Title | German: | Thixotrope wässrige Pflanzenschutzmittel-Suspension | [1996/13] | English: | Aqueuou thixotropic suspension of plant protection products | [1996/13] | French: | Suspension aqueuse thixotropique de produits phytosanitaires | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 15.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Request for further processing for: | 30.07.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 30.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 28.11.2001 | IE | 28.11.2001 | PT | 28.02.2002 | SE | 28.02.2002 | [2004/43] |
Former [2002/49] | GR | 28.11.2001 | |
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 28.02.2002 | |
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 28.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01283201 ; | [X]JPH05247435 ; | [X]JPH05286804 ; | [A]EP0022925 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 1 - page 6, line 29 * * page 9, line 4 - line 31 * * page 13, line 21 - page 14, line 9; example 1 ** claim 3 *; | [X]EP0028052 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 10 - page 5, line 13 * * Beispiel 1 u. Vergleichsbeispiel 1 *;; claim - *; | [DA]EP0110174 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * page 1 - page 4, line 17 * * page 5, line 6 - line 12; claim - *; | [X]EP0425729 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - CHEMICAL PATENTS INDEX, DOCUMENTATION ABSTRACTS JOURNAL, 7, Derwent World Patents Index, (19900221), vol. 89, no. 51, Database accession no. 89-375626, & JPH01283201 A 19891114 (NIHON NOYAKU KK) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [X] - CHEMICAL PATENTS INDEX, DOCUMENTATION ABSTRACTS JOURNAL, 7, Derwent World Patents Index, (19940105), vol. 93, no. 43, Database accession no. 93-339958, & JPH05247435 A 19930924 (NIPPON SILICA KOGYO KK) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [X] - CHEMICAL PATENTS INDEX, DOCUMENTATION ABSTRACTS JOURNAL, 7, Derwent World Patents Index, (19940209), vol. 93, no. 48, Database accession no. 93-382964, & JPH05286804 A 19931102 (TAKEDA CHEM. IND. LTD.) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - MARK, OTHMER ET AL., Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, Third Edition, NEW YORK, US;, WILEY & SONS [A] 1-9 * Band 6, Stichwort "Clays", Kapitel "Survey", Seiten 190-206 * * Abschnitt "Smectites (Montmorillonites)", Seite 197, letzter Absatz - Seite 200, Absatz 3 * | by applicant | EP0110174 | EP0134462 | EP0514768 | EP0592880 |