EP0700016 - Improvements in and relating to filters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markandey, Vishal 5630 Loring Drive, Apt. No. 157 Dallas, TX 75209 / US | 02 /
Gove, Robert J. 1405 Scarborough Lane Plano, TX 75075 / US | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113561.5 | 29.08.1995 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | US19940298547 | 30.08.1994 Original published format: US 298547 | [1996/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0700016 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700016 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/20 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
G06T5/20 (EP,US);
H04N7/01 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/10] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an Filtern | [1996/10] | English: | Improvements in and relating to filters | [1996/10] | French: | Améliorations relatives aux filtres | [1996/10] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 06.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Request for further processing for: | 17.10.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.11.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05160675 ; | [A]GB2174861 (SONY CORP) [A] 1,5,6,9-13 * column A * * page 4, line 65 - page 5, line 4 * * page 6, line 57 - line 64; figure 7 *; | [A]US5212659 (SCOTT JEFFREY W [US], et al) [A] 1,2,9,10 * column 11, line 34 - line 40; figures 7,10 *; | [Y]US5335020 (DIETERICH CHARLES B [US]) [Y] 1-13 * column A * * column 2, line 16 - line 35 * * column 3, line 35 - line 46; figures 1,3,4 *; | [Y] - BIAN K LIEN, "On the Cascade Realization of 2-D FIR Filters Designed by McClellan Transformation.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (199209), vol. 40, no. 9, page 23382340 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [000I] * * paragraph [00II]; figures 1-4 * | [A] - DARRELL W HORNING & RULPH CHASSAING, "IIR Filter Scaling for Real-TimeSignal Processing", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON EDUCATION, USA, (199102), vol. 34, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1109/13.79889, pages 108 - 112, XP000228261 [A] 1-10 * page 108, paragraph "Scaling and Overflow" *;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/13.79889 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931007), vol. 17, no. 559, Database accession no. (E - 1445), & JP05160675 A 19930625 (SONY CORP) [A] 2 * abstract * | Examination | US5008752 | US5253064 | - CARLBOM, I., "Optimal filter design for volume reconstruction and visualization", VISUALIZATION '93, PROCEEDINGS, IEEE CONFERENCE, (19931025), doi:doi:10.1109/VISUAL.1993.398851, pages 54 - 61, XP010138146 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VISUAL.1993.398851 |