EP0700046 - Cassette, storage case, and label to be applied to such cassette and storage case [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odagiri, Hirokazu c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr. rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113577.1 | 29.08.1995 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | JP19940207724 | 31.08.1994 Original published format: JP 20772494 | [1996/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0700046 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0700046 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700046 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/40, G11B23/087, G11B23/023 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
G11B23/40 (EP,US);
G11B23/04 (KR);
G11B23/023 (EP,US);
G11B23/087 (EP,US);
Y10S283/901 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1996/10] | Title | German: | Kassette, Aufbewahrungsbehälter, und Etikett für dergleiche Kassette und Aufbewahrungsbehälter | [1996/10] | English: | Cassette, storage case, and label to be applied to such cassette and storage case | [1996/10] | French: | Cassette, boîtier de rangement, et étiquette pourrent être appliquée à une telle cassette et un tel boîtier de rangement | [1996/10] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 10.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.2000 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA2069464 (KOHN DANIEL K [CA]) [X] 1-5,10,11 * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 32; figures 1-3 * | Examination | EP0583939 |