Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0701880 | Global Dossier | 07.04.1999 | B1 | EP0701880 | 20.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITGE940104 | 16.09.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69508869T | 02.12.1999 | T2 | DE69508869D1 | 12.05.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITGE940104 | 16.09.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1268332 | 27.02.1997 | B1 | ITGE940104 | 16.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITGE940104 | 16.09.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5641265 | 24.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | ITGE940104 | 16.09.1994 |