EP0760350 - Lifting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dunks, Anthony Phillip P.O. Box 160 Sebastopol Victoria 3350 / AU | For all designated states Coad, Trevor James 11 Peak Street Ballarat Victoria 3350 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states Dunks, Anthony Phillip P.O. Box 160 Sebastopol, Victoria 3350 / AU | ||
For all designated states Coad, Trevor James 11 Peak Street Ballarat, Victoria 3350 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunks, Anthony Phillip PO Box 160 Sebastopol Victoria 3350 / AU | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Werner-Eckert-Str. 4 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Zeitler & Dickel Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Herrnstrasse 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113794.2 | 01.09.1995 | [1997/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760350 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B66F7/06, B66F11/04 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
B66F7/0633 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/10] | Title | German: | Hebevorrichtung | [1997/10] | English: | Lifting device | [1997/10] | French: | Appareil de levage | [1997/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/34] | 05.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.10.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0560256 (KANAZAWA YUKIO [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7,13-16 * figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [A]DE8631449U (ZAPF) [A] 1-3,5,21 * figures 1-3; claims 1,2,4,5,7 *; | [A]DE9108825U (LANGEWELLPOTT) [A] 17,29,30 * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph L; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3315136 (RUTHMANN ANTON GMBH & CO) [A] 17,18,29,30 * column 4, line 15 - line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4499970 (HUSSEY IAN G [US]); | [A]FR2609975 (REALISA AMANDINOISES SARL ET [FR]); | [A]US4638610 (HEIKKINEN URHO [FI]) |