EP0703021 - Method of manufacturing a two-part cage nut [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A. Raymond GmbH & Co. KG Teichstrasse 57 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | [1996/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Golczyk, Ralph Ritterstrasse 89 D-79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | 02 /
Hullmann, Klaus Friedensgasse 4 D-79540 Lörrach / DE | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Kirchgaesser, Johannes p/a Fa. A. RAYMOND KG Teichstrasse 57 79539 Lörrach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Kirchgaesser, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. p/a Fa. A. RAYMOND KG, Teichstrasse 57 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113814.8 | 02.09.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | DE19944433470 | 20.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4433470 | [1996/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0703021 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0703021 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703021 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B21D53/24, F16B37/04 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
B21D53/24 (EP,US);
B21D35/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer zweiteiligen Käfigmutter | [1996/13] | English: | Method of manufacturing a two-part cage nut | [1996/13] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un écrou encagé en deux pièces | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2159573 (TINNERMAN GEORGE A); | [A]FR1190342 (W. ZIEHR); | [A]FR2584465 (NIFCO INC [JP], et al); | [DA]EP0391764 (RAPID) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0391764 |