EP0705792 - Process for improving the quality of quartz sand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1997/51] |
Former [1996/15] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ewald, Dirk Breite-Strasse 2 - 4 D-50354 Hürth / DE | 02 /
Tapper, Alexander, Dr. Kastanienweg 10 D-41239 Mönchengladbach / DE | 03 /
Schimmel, Günther, Dr. Ehrenstrasse 16 D-50374 Erftstadt / DE | 04 /
Wilkens, Jan, Dr. Litschgasse 8 D-50354 Hürth / DE | [1996/15] | Application number, filing date | 95113966.6 | 06.09.1995 | [1996/15] | Priority number, date | DE19944435568 | 05.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4435568 | [1996/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0705792 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0705792 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/12 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
C03C1/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Qualität von Quarzsand | [1996/15] | English: | Process for improving the quality of quartz sand | [1996/15] | French: | Procédé pour améliorer la qualité de sable de quartz | [1996/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 31.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.03.1999 | GB | 31.03.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/24] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
FR | 27.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/03] | GB | 31.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2111035 (BRITISH IND SAND LTD) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0233665 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2049359 (WERNER DUSING, et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPS60246241 ; | [A]SU920009 ; | [A]JPS4523605B | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 04, Database accession no. 86-024624, & JPS60246241 A 19851205 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 07, Database accession no. 83-17053k, & SU920009 A 19820415 (GEN INORGANIC CHEM) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 70, no. 32, Database accession no. 70-57122r, & JPS4523605B B1 00000000 (HANADA T) [A] 1 * abstract * |