EP0702267 - Apparatus for drying photo-sensitive material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD. 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd. 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP | ||
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states NORITSU KOKI CO. LTD. 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken 640 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Domoto, Tatsuya Noritsu Koki Co.,Ltd., 579-1, Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken / JP | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/38] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 80603 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/12] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113977.3 | 06.09.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | JP19940219133 | 13.09.1994 Original published format: JP 21913394 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0702267 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0702267 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702267 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/74, F26B13/10, F26B13/14, G03D15/02 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
G03D15/022 (EP,US);
F26B13/10 (EP,US);
F26B13/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/12] | G03C1/74, F26B13/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [1996/12] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Trocknen lichtempfindlicher Materialien | [1996/12] | English: | Apparatus for drying photo-sensitive material | [1996/12] | French: | Appareil pour sèches des matériaux photosensibles | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 09.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.04.2001 | LI | 11.04.2001 | [2002/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3403454 (SMITH JR HORACE L) [X] 1 * column 3, line 39 * * column 4, line 72 - column 6, line 18; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE3313876 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US5231774 (KOSE JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 7 - column 6, line 61; figures 1-4 * |