EP0701001 - DNA separating, fractionating and analyzing method and system therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kambara, Hideki 1-4-3 Kitanodai Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo 192 / JP | 02 /
Okano, Kazunori 5-17-2-402 Hon-cho Shiki-shi, Saitama-ken 353 / JP | [1996/11] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114067.2 | 07.09.1995 | [1996/11] | Priority number, date | JP19940214055 | 07.09.1994 Original published format: JP 21405594 | [1996/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0701001 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0701001 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6837 (EP);
C12Q1/6869 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6837, C12Q2565/514, C12Q2535/125, C12Q2525/191 (EP);
C12Q1/6837, C12Q2565/537, C12Q2565/514, C12Q2525/191 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Trennung, Fraktionierung und Analyse von DNS | [1996/11] | English: | DNA separating, fractionating and analyzing method and system therefor | [1996/11] | French: | Méthode et système pour séparer, fractionner et analyser de l'ADN | [1996/11] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/43] | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9317126 (PUBLIC HEALTH RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK) [X] 1-14 * page 2, line 7 - page 13, line 17 * * page 31, line 12 - page 56; figures 1-6 * [A] 15-20; | [A]WO9411530 (TRUSTEES OF BOSTON UNIVIVERSITY) [A] 1,4,5,7,15-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0303459 (PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE) [A] 1,2,15,20 * column W *; | [A]WO8504674 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.) [A] 1,16-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9401582 (MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL) [Y] 15-20 * page 29, line 25 - page 34, line 25 * * page 37, line 5 - line 10 *; | [Y]WO9325563 (CITY OF HOPE) [Y] 15-20 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, line 16 * * page 11, paragraph L - page 12 *; | [DA]JPH0622798 ; | [PX]EP0649852 (HITACHI, LTD.) [PX] 1-15,20 * column W *; | [PX]EP0630972 (HITACHI, LTD.) [PX] 1-20 * column W * | [A] - J. HODGSON, "Genome mapping the "easy" way", BIOTECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK US, (199406), vol. 12, pages 581 - 584, XP002007722 [A] 11-14 * the whole document * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940425), vol. 018, no. 226, Database accession no. (C - 1194), & JP06022798 A 19940201 (HITACHI LTD) [DA] 16-19 * abstract * | [PX] - A.B. CHETVERIN ET AL., "Oligonucleotide arrays: new concepts and possibilities", BIOTECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK US, (199411), vol. 12, pages 1093 - 1099, XP002007723 [PX] 1-15,20 * the whole document * |