blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0704761

EP0704761 - Process for forming a colored image [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/14]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bodager, Gregory A.
P.O. Box 122
Monroeton, Pennsylvania 18832 / US
02 / Beighle, Philip Lew
4 Cherry Drive
Colts Neck, New Jersey 07722 / US
[1996/14]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/14]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date95114112.608.09.1995
[1996/14]
Priority number, dateUS1994031573930.09.1994         Original published format: US 315739
[1996/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0704761
Date:03.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/14]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication
No.:EP0704761
Date:24.07.1996
[1996/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0704761
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.1996
ClassificationIPC:G03F3/10
[1996/14]
CPC:
G03F3/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE [1996/14]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines farbigen Bildes[1996/14]
English:Process for forming a colored image[1996/14]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d'images en couleurs[1996/14]
Examination procedure08.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/27]
14.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.1999Fee for grant paid
08.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9202857  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.