EP0689232 - Process for deposition of a tungsten layer on a semiconductor wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. P.O. Box 58039 M/S 0934 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95052-8039 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. P.O. Box 58039, M/S 0934, 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95052-8039 / US | ||
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS INC. PO Box 58039 Santa Clara California 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Mei 863 E. Estates Dr. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
Leung, Cissy 348 Pagosa Way Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 03 /
Wang, David Nin-Kou 15230 Sobey Rd. Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 04 /
Cheng, David 974 Sherman Oaks Dr. San Jose, CA 95128 / US | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/52] | Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Flüggenstrasse 13 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114145.6 | 24.08.1990 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | US19890398653 | 25.08.1989 Original published format: US 398653 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0689232 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0689232 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/285, H01L21/768, H01L21/3205 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
H01L21/76838 (EP,US);
H01L21/283 (KR);
H01L21/28556 (EP,US);
H01L21/32051 (EP,US);
Y10S148/025 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/52] | H01L21/285, H01L21/768 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abscheibung einer Wolfram-Schicht auf einer Halbleiterscheibe | [1995/52] | English: | Process for deposition of a tungsten layer on a semiconductor wafer | [1995/52] | French: | Procédé de dépôt d'une couche de tungstène sur une pastille semi-conductrice | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 30.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90116274.3 / EP0414267 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1932932 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [A] 1,7,16,22,23 * page 4, paragraph 2 *; | [A]EP0326217 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-3,10-18,25-30 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 17 *; | [A]JPS62253770 ; | [A]JPS63272049 ; | [A]EP0174743 (THIOKOL MORTON INC [US]) [A] 5,19,20 * column 1, line 1 - line 62 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880427), vol. 012, no. 139, Database accession no. (C - 491), & JP62253770 A 19871105 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 13,14,28,29 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890307), vol. 013, no. 097, Database accession no. (E - 723), & JP63272049 A 19881109 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-6,16-21 * abstract * | by applicant | US4785962 |