EP0708423 - Coin-operated locker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPHA CORPORATION 6-8, Fukuura 1-chome, Kanazawa-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states ALPHA Corporation 6-8, Fukuura 1-chome, Kanazawa-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236 / JP | ||
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states ALPHA CORPORATION 6-8, Fukuura 1-chome, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-Pref., 236 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsukada, Kazuo 20, Nanashima-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Hans-Werner Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Schmitz, Hans-Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber Patentanwälte Ludwig-Ganghofer-Strasse 20 D-82031 Grünwald / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114400.5 | 13.09.1995 | [1996/17] | Priority number, date | JP19940226837 | 21.09.1994 Original published format: JP 22683794 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708423 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708423 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/12 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
G07F17/12 (EP,US);
Y10S70/41 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/17] | Title | German: | Münzbetätigtes Schliessfach | [1996/17] | English: | Coin-operated locker | [1996/17] | French: | Casier de consigne, actionné par pièce de monnaie | [1996/17] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 03.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05258177 ; | [A]JPH03214298 ; | [A]US4773020 (ANDERSON CARL A [SE], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 41 - line 49; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4305843 (ITOKI KK [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2269469 (TOKYO SEIMITSU CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* figure 1; claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940114), vol. 018, no. 024, Database accession no. (P - 1675), & JP05258177 A 19931008 (DAIWA KOGYO KK) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911213), vol. 015, no. 495, Database accession no. (P - 1288), & JP03214298 A 19910919 (OMRON CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |