Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0707058
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.05.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
11.06.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
26.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.03.1999 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] |
25.01.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.01.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.12.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.11.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.09.1998 |
First examination report |
|
14.09.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.10.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.08.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] |
02.03.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] |