Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI0707058T | 31.12.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | EP95114519 | 15.09.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH08199177 | Global Dossier | 06.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU685990B | Global Dossier | 29.01.1998 | B2 | AU3172495 | 26.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0707058 | Global Dossier | 28.07.1999 | B1 | EP0707058 | 17.04.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE182611T | 15.08.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9504380 | 27.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2160434 | 14.04.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1046953C | 01.12.1999 | C | CN1129247 | 21.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69511032T | 24.02.2000 | T2 | DE69511032D1 | 02.09.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0707058T | 10.01.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2134980T | 16.10.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3031081T | 31.12.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1270656 | 07.05.1997 | B | ITMI942089 | 13.04.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR960014309 | 22.05.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9504294 | 31.01.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY132055 | 28.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ280096 | 27.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2144058 | 10.01.2000 | C1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG42778 | 17.10.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5593463 | 14.01.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI942089 | 13.10.1994 |