EP0707058 - Fuel composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGIP PETROLI S.p.A. Via Laurentina, 449 00142 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states AGIP PETROLI S.p.A. Via Laurentina 449 00142 Roma / IT | ||
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states AGIP PETROLI S.p.A. Via Laurentina 449 I-00142 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gambini, Paola Ripa Ticinese 107 Milano / IT | 02 /
Gatti, Emilio Via Aldini 53 Milano / IT | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1996/16] | Gennari, Marco Eniricerche S.p.A., BREL, Via F. Maritano, 26 I-20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 95114519.2 | 15.09.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | IT1994MI02089 | 13.10.1994 Original published format: IT MI942089 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707058 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707058 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/16 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
C10L1/1641 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/1608 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/143 (EP,KR,US);
C10L10/04 (EP,US);
C10L1/1616 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/1824 (EP,US);
C10L1/1832 (EP,US);
C10L1/1852 (EP,US);
C10L1/198 (EP,US);
C10L1/1985 (EP,US);
C10L1/221 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/222 (KR);
C10L1/2225 (EP,US);
C10L1/223 (EP,US);
C10L1/224 (EP,US);
C10L1/232 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/238 (EP,US);
C10L1/2383 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/16] | Extension states | SI | 15.09.1995 | Title | German: | Brennstoffzusammensetzung | [1996/16] | English: | Fuel composition | [1996/16] | French: | Composition combustible | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 17.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3252771 (CLOUGH THOMAS J, et al); | [A]US3749560 (PERILSTEIN W) [A] 1,4-6 * claims 1,10 *; | [A]EP0290088 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-9,12-15 *; | [DA]US4846848 (MILES RICHARD [GB], et al) | Examination | US4420647 | by applicant | US3574576 | US3649229 | US3873278 | US4160648 | US4247301 | US4477261 | EP0151621 | US4846848 | US5248315 | IT19800020106 |