EP0707091 - Zirconia-based tipped blades having macrocracked structure and process for producing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Praxair S.T. Technology, Inc. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06810-5113 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states PRAXAIR S.T. TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, Connecticut 06810-5113 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Thomas Alan 5865 Winthrop Ave. Indianapolis, Indiana 46220 / US | 02 /
Lemen, Don Joseph 7655 Moran Ct. Indianapolis, Indiana 46268 / US | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114579.6 | 15.09.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | US19940307204 | 16.09.1994 Original published format: US 307204 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707091 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707091 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/02 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
F01D11/12 (EP,US);
C23C4/02 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49318 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49336 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/16] | Title | German: | Schaufeln mit Spitzen auf Zirkonoxidbsis mit Macroriss-Struktur und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [1998/21] | English: | Zirconia-based tipped blades having macrocracked structure and process for producing it | [1996/16] | French: | Aubes avec des pointes à base de zircone possédant une structure macrofissurée et son procédé de production | [1998/21] |
Former [1996/16] | Schaufeln mit Einsätzen aus Zirconiumoxid mit Macrorissstruktur und deren Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [1996/16] | Aubes avec des potines à base de zircone possédant une structure macrofissurée et son procédé de production | Examination procedure | 26.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]US5073433 (TAYLOR THOMAS A [US]) [YD] 1,3,4 * column 4, line 47 - line 49 * * examples 1,2; claims 1-20 * [A] 2,5,7; | [YD]US5059095 (KUSHNER BURTON A [US], et al) [YD] 1,3,4 * column 5, line 6 - line 20; claims 1-16 *; | [A]US5338577 (BURDETTE II JACKIE B [US]) [A] 5,7 * column 6, line 5 - line 57 * * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 10; claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0568315 (PROGRESSIVE BLASTING SYSTEMS I [US]) [A] 8 * claim 6 *; | [A]JPS61207566 ; | [A]US4377371 (WISANDER DONALD W, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870207), vol. 11, no. 43, Database accession no. (C - 402), & JP61207566 A 19860913 (SHOWA DENKO) [A] 6 * abstract * | [A] - G. JOHNER, "FLAME RIG TESTING OF BARRIER COATINGS AND CORRELATION WITH ENGINE RESULTS", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY A, NEW YORK,USA, vol. 3, no. 6, pages 2516 - 2524 | by applicant | US5059095 | US5073433 |