EP0704723 - Method for producing polarising films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/14] | Polarising film | ||
[2000/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1999/11] |
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ostoja Starzewski, Karl-Heinz Aleksander, Dr. Jeschkenweg 10 D-61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | [1996/14] | Application number, filing date | 95114684.4 | 19.09.1995 | [1996/14] | Priority number, date | DE19944434964 | 30.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4434964 | [1996/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0704723 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0704723 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
G02B5/3033 (EP,KR,US);
G02B1/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polarisationsfolien | [2000/01] | English: | Method for producing polarising films | [2000/01] | French: | Méthode de fabrication pour des feuilles polarisantes | [2000/01] |
Former [1996/14] | Polarisationsfolie | ||
Former [1996/14] | Polarising film | ||
Former [1996/14] | Feuille polarisante | Examination procedure | 09.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.09.2001 | [2003/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5577706 ; | [A]DE1569165 (MARKS ALVIN MELVILLE, et al) [A] 1-3,8 * page 4, paragraph 3 - paragraph 6 * * page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 4 - page 12, line 4 ** page 16, paragraph L - page 17, paragraph 1 *; | [YDA]EP0297927 (UNITIKA LTD [JP]) [YD] 1,8 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 6, line 13 - line 31 * * column 9, line 31 - line 35 * * column 9, line 44 - line 50 * * claims 4,16,20 * [A] 2-4,7; | [A]EP0374627 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,8 * abstract * * page 5, line 43 - line 47 *; | [X]EP0564925 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 1, line 1 - line 10 * * column 2, line 1 - line 20 * * examples 3,5 *; | [Y]DE4211779 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [Y] 1,8 * abstract * * column 2, line 50 - line 54 * * claims 1,4,6,7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800829), vol. 004, no. 122, Database accession no. (P - 025), & JP55077706 A 19800611 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [A] 1-3,8 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0297927 | EP0249019 |