EP0690663 - Coil arrangement for induction heating of sheet metal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National, 2, rue Louis Murat 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National 2, rue Louis Murat 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National 2, rue Louis Murat F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferry, Georges Charles, Résidence l'Hermitage 16, avenue Charles de Gaulle F-78230 Le Pecq / FR | 02 /
Peureux, Jean-Louis Bernard 5, rue de Paris F-89140 Villethierry / FR | 03 /
Roehr, Philippe 1, rue de l'Etang F-68360 Soultz / FR | 04 /
Delassus, Jean 31, rue des Carrières f-95160 Montmorency / FR | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95114697.6 | 14.10.1992 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | FR19910012627 | 14.10.1991 Original published format: FR 9112627 | [1996/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690663 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690663 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/44, H05B6/02, C21D1/42 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
F27D99/0006 (EP,US);
C21D9/60 (EP,US);
F27B9/067 (EP,US);
F27B9/18 (EP,US);
H05B6/44 (EP,US);
F27D2099/0015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, NL, PT [1996/01] | Title | German: | Induktionsanordnung zum Heizen von Metallbändern | [1996/01] | English: | Coil arrangement for induction heating of sheet metal | [1996/01] | French: | Inducteur de chauffage par induction de bandes métalliques | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 15.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92402809.5 / EP0538124 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.04.1998 | GB | 22.04.1998 | GR | 22.04.1998 | IT | 22.04.1998 | NL | 22.04.1998 | DK | 22.07.1998 | PT | 22.07.1998 | DE | 23.07.1998 | LU | 14.10.1998 | IE | 23.10.1998 | BE | 31.10.1998 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | ES | 22.04.1998 | |
GB | 22.04.1998 | ||
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
NL | 22.04.1998 | ||
DK | 22.07.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
DE | 23.07.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 22.04.1998 | |
GB | 22.04.1998 | ||
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
NL | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
DE | 23.07.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 22.04.1998 | |
GB | 22.04.1998 | ||
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
DE | 23.07.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
DE | 23.07.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/23] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IE | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
DE | 23.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IE | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
DE | 23.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
IE | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
DE | 23.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
IE | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
DE | 23.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
IE | 22.04.1998 | ||
DE | 23.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
DE | 23.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | DE | 23.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02301522 ; | [A]US2583227 (NEIDIGH RAY S); | [A]FR1193496 (DEUTSCHE EDELSTAHLWERKE AG, et al) [A] 1 * page 3, column L, line 6 - line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3489875 (ROSS NICHOLAS V); | [A]US3649804 (KASPER ROBERT J) [A] * column 1, line 6 - line 51 *; | [A]EP0194708 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 29 - page 10, line 26 * * page 17, line 27 - page 19, line 32; figures 5,8,9 *; | [A]GB2184927 (AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORP); | [A]EP0407660 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 51; figures 1-5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910221), vol. 15, no. 76, Database accession no. (C - 809), & JP02301522 A 19901213 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND. LTD.) [A] * abstract * |