EP0764847 - Gas sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Building Technologies AG Bellerivestrasse 36 8034 Zürich / CH | [2001/02] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states Siemens Building Technologies AG Alte Landstrasse 411 8708 Männedorf / CH | ||
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states CERBERUS AG Alte Landstrasse 411 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forster, Martin, Dr. Sonnenbergstrasse 16 CH-8645 Jona / CH | 02 /
Witikovsky, Friedrich Riethof 2 CH-8604 Volketswil / CH | 03 /
Scherrer, Niklaus Eichwiesstrasse 73 CH-8645 Jona / CH | 04 /
Honegger, Susanne Gschwaderstrasse 8 CH-8610 Uster / CH | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Dittrich, Horst, et al Siemens Building Technologies AG Fire & Security Products 8708 Männedorf / CH | [2009/40] |
Former [2001/05] | Dittrich, Horst, Dr., et al Siemens Building Technologies AG, Cerberus Division 8708 Männedorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 95114766.9 | 20.09.1995 | [1997/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0764847 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764847 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00, G01N27/16 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
G01N27/16 (EP);
G01N33/0009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/13] | Title | German: | Gasdetektor | [1997/13] | English: | Gas sensor | [1997/13] | French: | Capteur de gaz | [1997/13] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 21.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3476517 (SMITH ALBERT H) [X] 1,4-6,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0016351 (CERBERUS AG [CH]) [A] 1,5-7 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1057735 (MINI OF POWER) [A] 1,5,6,8 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS58146845 ; | [A]GB2088559 (COAL INDUSTRY PATENTS LTD) [A] 1,4-6,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0032844 (SIEGER J & S LTD [GB]) [A] 1-6,8 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS6080749 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831126), vol. 007, no. 266, Database accession no. (P - 239), & JP58146845 A 19830901 (RICOH KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,3,5-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850907), vol. 009, no. 221, Database accession no. (P - 386), & JP60080749 A 19850508 (SHIN COSMOS DENKI KK) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | by applicant | US4176311 |