EP0764762 - Silencer arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Balcke-Dürr GmbH Homberger Strasse 2 40882 Ratingen / DE | [1997/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trage, Burkhard Noldenkothen 43 40882 Ratingen / DE | 02 /
Leitz, Richard Gerresheimer Strasse 88 40721 Hilden / DE | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114780.0 | 20.09.1995 | [1997/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0764762 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F01B31/16, F01D25/30 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
A01C17/001 (EP);
F05B2260/96 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Schalldämmung | [1997/13] | English: | Silencer arrangement | [1997/13] | French: | Dispositif de silencieux | [1997/13] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 27.03.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2447069 (WESTEEL GUY) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 1 - line 26 * * page 3, paragraph L; figure - *; | [A]US4180141 (JUDD FREDERICK V H [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 35; figure - *; | [A]GB2138886 (CHALLIS LOUIS A) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 84 - line 102; figure - *; | [A]DE2224249 (WESTINGHOUSE) [A] 1-3 * page 9, paragraphs 1-2; figure - *; | [E]DE4412801 (BALCKE DUERR AG [DE]) [E] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [E]DE9421436U (BALCKE DUERR AG [DE]) [E] 1-5 * the whole document * |