EP0702030 - Process for preparing olefin polymers with large molecular weight distribution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2001/37] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Am Yachthafen 2 77694 Kehl / DE | ||
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states TARGOR GmbH Rheinstrasse 4 G 55116 Mainz / DE | ||
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winter, Andreas, Dr. Taunusblick 10 D-61479 Glashütten / DE | 02 /
Dolle, Volker, Dr. Wolfsgartenstrasse 27 D-64625 Bensheim / DE | 03 /
Spaleck, Walter, Dr. Sulzbacher Strasse 63 D-65835 Liederbach / DE | [1996/12] | Application number, filing date | 95114875.8 | 25.05.1992 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | DE19914117259 | 27.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4117259 | [1996/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702030 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702030 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/642, C08F10/00 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
C08F10/06 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F2420/09 (EP);
C08F4/65904 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65904 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/01, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/15 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/16 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyolefinen mit breiter Molmassenverteilung | [1996/12] | English: | Process for preparing olefin polymers with large molecular weight distribution | [1996/12] | French: | Procédé de préparation de polyoléfines à large répartition de poids moléculaire | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 21.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92108788.8 / EP0516018 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11] | Request for further processing for: | 18.06.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 19.06.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.08.1998 | Decision despatched | 05.09.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 05.09.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 24.09.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 21.03.2001 | LU | 25.05.2001 | SE | 21.06.2001 | CH | 24.06.2001 | LI | 24.06.2001 | [2015/21] |
Former [2005/23] | NL | 21.03.2001 | |
LU | 25.05.2001 | ||
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | NL | 21.03.2001 | |
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 21.06.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0128046 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1* claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP0226463 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-14 *; | [X]EP0399348 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0279586 | EP0344887 | by applicant | EP0128045 | DE3640924 | EP0277004 | EP0302424 | EP0310734 | EP0320762 | EP0355439 | EP0387691 | - J. POLYM. SEI, POL. CHEM. ED., (1985), vol. 23, page 2117 | - JOURNAL OF ORGANOMET. CHEM., (1985), pages 63 - 67 | - S. PASYNKIEWICZ, POLYHEDRON, (1990), vol. 9, page 429 |