EP0690490 - Method of making a flip chip using electrically conductive polymers and dielectrics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/01] | Flip chip technology using electrically conductive polymers and dielectrics | ||
[2000/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PFC Corporation 14 Fortune Drive Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [1998/13] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states EPOXY TECHNOLOGY, INC. 14 Fortune Drive P.O. Box 567 Billerica Massachusetts 01821 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Estes, Richard H. 15 Blackstone Circle Pelham, NH 03076 / US | 02 /
Kulesza, Frank W. 3 Grant Road Winchester, MA 01890 / US | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G., et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Hess, Peter K., Dipl.-Phys., et al Bardehle,Pagenberg,Dost,Altenburg,Geissler,Isenbruck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/01] | Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114886.5 | 18.12.1990 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | US19890452191 | 18.12.1989 Original published format: US 452191 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0690490 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0690490 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690490 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60, H01L23/485, H01L23/532 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
H01L23/3171 (EP,US);
H01L21/4853 (EP,US);
H01L21/4867 (EP,US);
H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H01L21/60 (KR);
H01L23/4828 (EP,US);
H01L23/485 (KR);
H01L23/5328 (EP,US);
H01L24/11 (EP,US);
H01L24/12 (US);
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1319 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29101 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8319 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83856 (EP,US);
H01L24/03 (EP);
H01L24/05 (EP);
H01L24/13 (EP);
H01L2924/00013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01022 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01032 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01052 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0665 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0781 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10329 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/351 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10674 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10977 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1189 (EP,US);
H05K3/305 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1092 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49126 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/29101, H01L2924/014, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/29099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [1996/01] | H01L21/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Flip-Chips, wobei elektrisch leitende Polymere und Dielektrika angewendet werden | [2000/34] | English: | Method of making a flip chip using electrically conductive polymers and dielectrics | [2000/34] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un "Flip Chip" utilisant des polymères électroconductifs et des diélectriques | [2000/34] |
Former [1996/01] | Flip-Chip-Technologie, wobei elektrisch leitende Polymere und Dielektrika angewendet werden | ||
Former [1996/01] | Flip chip technology using electrically conductive polymers and dielectrics | ||
Former [1996/01] | Technologie "Flip Chip" utilisant des polymères électroconductifs et des diélectriques | Examination procedure | 21.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 21.11.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 11.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91902599.9 / EP0506859 | Divisional application(s) | EP00126587.5 / EP1089331 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Request for further processing for: | 23.09.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1996 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2001 | BE | 04.10.2001 | GR | 04.10.2001 | NL | 04.10.2001 | LU | 18.12.2001 | DK | 04.01.2002 | SE | 04.01.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | [2005/23] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 04.10.2001 | |
BE | 04.10.2001 | ||
GR | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 04.10.2001 | |
BE | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 04.10.2001 | |
BE | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 04.10.2001 | |
BE | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 04.10.2001 | |
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 04.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62104142 ; | [XA]DE3702354 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * claims 1,5,6 * [A] 2,3,17-19; | [A]EP0299894 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 44 - line 48; claims 1,3 *; | [A]US4840302 (GARDNER DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6* figure 1; claims 1,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871012), vol. 011, no. 312, Database accession no. (E - 548), & JP62104142 A 19870514 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,18 * abstract * | Examination | WO9109419 |