EP0708329 - Capillary electrophoresis apparatus and its method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.1997 [1997/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soga, Tomoyoshi 5-12-14-201, Kamirenjaku Mitakashi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Yoshinori 4-20-15-403, Shimorenjaku Mitakashi, Tokyo / JP | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95115081.2 | 25.09.1995 | [1996/17] | Priority number, date | JP19940233805 | 28.09.1994 Original published format: JP 23380594 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708329 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
G01N27/44752 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1996/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kapillarelektroforese und deren Verfahren | [1996/17] | English: | Capillary electrophoresis apparatus and its method | [1996/17] | French: | Appareil d'électrophorèse capillaire et sa méthode | [1996/17] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 25.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/30] | 20.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4690749 (VAN ALSTINE JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 8, line 33 - column 10, line 31 *; | [A]GB1233907 (INCENTIVE RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT AB) [A] 1 * page 2, line 129 - page 3, line 68 * | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, ""POLYMER COATINGS REDUCE ELECTRO-OSMOSIS", NTIS TECH. NOTES, SPRINGFIELD, VA, US, page 680, XP000074333 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * |