EP0706946 - Method and device for handling stacks of blanks with strapping band [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | ||
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 D-27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 D-27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Mutschall, Hugo Deelsener Strasse 6 D-27308 Kirchlinteln / DE | 03 /
Hill, Frank Bei den drei Pfählen 29 D-28205 Bremen / DE | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [1996/16] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 D-28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95115106.7 | 26.09.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | DE19944436330 | 11.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4436330 | [1996/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706946 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0706946 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
B65B69/0025 (EP,US);
Y10T83/207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1996/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Handhaben von Zuschnitt-Stapeln mit Banderolen | [1996/16] | English: | Method and device for handling stacks of blanks with strapping band | [1996/16] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour faire la manutention de piles de découpes avec banderole | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0146391 (DE LA RUE SYST [GB]) [A] 1-10; | [A]EP0100990 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [A] 1-10; | [A]DE4010340 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [A] 1-10; | [A]EP0251414 (UITERT SPEC MASCHF VAN [NL]) [A] 1-10; | [A]US4718157 (KEYZERS HENRICUS M [NL], et al) [A] 1-10; | [A]EP0607626 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [A] 1,5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 1-10 | by applicant | EP0100990 | EP0146391 |