EP0703670 - Output buffer circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohashi, Masayuki, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus, et al Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann, Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95115149.7 | 26.09.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | JP19940229308 | 26.09.1994 Original published format: JP 22930894 | [1996/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0703670 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0703670 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | [1996/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703670 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/017, H03K17/06, H03K3/356 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
H03K19/01721 (EP,US);
H03K19/0175 (KR);
H03K17/063 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/13] | H03K19/017 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/13] | Title | German: | Ausgangspufferschaltung | [1996/13] | English: | Output buffer circuit | [1996/13] | French: | Circuit tampon de sortie | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 23.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4992681 (URAKAWA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 4 * figure 3 *; | [A]JPS57192119 ; | [A]EP0559996 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [A] 1,11 * figure 5 * | [X] - FURUTANI K ET AL, "AN ADJUSTABLE OUTPUT DRIVER WITH SELF-RECOVERING VPP GENERATOR FOR 4MX16 DRAM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, SAN DIEGO, MAY 9 - 12, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930509), no. CONF. 15, pages 25.03.01 - 25.03.04, XP000409746 [X] 1-3,5,11-14,16 * figures 9,10 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830217), vol. 007, no. 040, Database accession no. (E - 159), & JP57192119 A 19821126 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [A] 4 * abstract * | [A] - "ICS YIELD HIGH-SIDE FET-DRIVE SUPPLY 11 V ABOVE POWER RAIL", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, (19911010), vol. 39, no. 19, page 138, XP000255302 [A] 1,11 | Examination | US5128560 |