EP0702084 - Recombinant retroviruses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford Biomedica (UK) Ltd Medawar Center Robert Robinson Avenue Oxford Science Park Oxford, OX4 4GA / GB | [2006/09] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608 / US | ||
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states CHIRON VIAGENE, INC. 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608 / US | ||
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states VIAGENE, INC. 11055 Roselle Street San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gruber, Harry E. 13083 Maritime Place San Diego, California 92130 / US | 02 /
Jolly, Douglas J. 277 Hillcrest Drive Leucadia, California 92024 / US | 03 /
Respess, James G. 4966 Lamont Street San Diego, California 92109 / US | 04 /
Laikino, Paul K. 12433 Caminito Mira Del Mar San Diego, California 92130 / US | [1996/15] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D. Young & Co. 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2003/02] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1997/09] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1996/15] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1996/12] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95115441.8 | 21.03.1989 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | US19880170515 | 21.03.1988 Original published format: US 170515 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702084 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702084 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, C12N9/50, C12N15/11, C12N9/12, C07K14/73 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP);
A61K38/2013 (EP);
A61K38/217 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K14/70514 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP);
C12Q1/02 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
A61K2039/5256 (EP);
A61K2039/53 (EP);
A61K2039/57 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP);
C12N2740/10043 (EP);
C12N2740/13022 (EP);
C12N2740/16022 (EP);
C12N2740/16023 (EP);
C12N2740/16043 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/12] | Title | German: | Rekombinante Retroviren | [1996/12] | English: | Recombinant retroviruses | [1996/12] | French: | Rétrovirus recombinants | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.03.1999 | Observations by third parties | 10.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.06.1999 | Observations by third parties | 27.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89105059.3 / EP0334301 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2000
08.12.2004
WITHDRAWN Fielding, Michael Terry Upham Street, Lower Upham Hampshire, SO32 1JA / GB Opponent's representative White, Martin Paul Marks & Clerk LLP Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | 02
21.09.2000
20.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE COHEN, Jacques 139, rue de Courlancy 51100 REIMS / FR Opponent's representative Becker, Philippe Cabinet Becker & Associés 25 Rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | 03
22.09.2000
20.10.2000
ADMISSIBLE Novartis AG 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Kassow, Anders Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2000
08.12.2004
WITHDRAWN Fielding, Michael Terry Upham Street, Lower Upham Hampshire, SO32 1JA / GB Opponent's representative White, Martin Paul Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
02
21.09.2000
20.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE COHEN, Jacques 139, rue de Courlancy 51100 REIMS / FR Opponent's representative Becker, Philippe Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | |||
03
22.09.2000
20.10.2000
ADMISSIBLE Novartis AG 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Kassow, Anders Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2008/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2000
08.12.2004
WITHDRAWN Fielding, Michael Terry Upham Street, Lower Upham Hampshire, SO32 1JA / GB Opponent's representative White, Martin Paul Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
02
21.09.2000
20.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE COHEN, Jacques 139, rue de Courlancy 51100 REIMS / FR Opponent's representative Becker, Philippe Cabinet Becker & Associés 35, rue des Mathurins 75008 Paris / FR | |||
03
22.09.2000
20.10.2000
ADMISSIBLE Novartis AG 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Kassow, Anders Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2006/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2000
08.12.2004
WITHDRAWN Fielding, Michael Terry Upham Street, Lower Upham Hampshire, SO32 1JA / GB Opponent's representative White, Martin Paul Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
02
21.09.2000
20.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE COHEN, Jacques 139, rue de Courlancy 51100 REIMS / FR Opponent's representative Becker, Philippe Cabinet Becker & Associés 35, rue des Mathurins 75008 Paris / FR | |||
03
22.09.2000
20.10.2000
ADMISSIBLE Novartis AG 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Gros, Florent Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property, Patent & Trademark Department CH 4002 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2005/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2000
08.12.2004
WITHDRAWN Fielding, Michael Terry Upham Street, Lower Upham Hampshire, SO32 1JA / GB Opponent's representative White, Martin Paul Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
02
21.09.2000
20.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE COHEN, Jacques 139, rue de Courlancy 51100 REIMS / FR Opponent's representative Becker, Philippe Cabinet Becker & Associés 35, rue des Mathurins 75008 Paris / FR | |||
03
22.09.2000
20.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE Novartis AG 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Gros, Florent Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property, Patent & Trademark Department CH 4002 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2000/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2000
Fielding, Michael Terry Upham Street, Lower Upham Hampshire, SO32 1JA / GB Opponent's representative White, Martin Paul Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street GB-London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
02
21.09.2000
COHEN, Jacques 139, rue de Courlancy 51100 REIMS / FR Opponent's representative Becker, Philippe Cabinet Becker & Associés 10, rue de Milan 75009 Paris / FR | |||
03
22.09.2000
Novartis AG 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Gros, Florent Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property, Patent & Trademark Department CH 4002 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2000/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2000
WITHDRAWN Fielding, Michael Terry Upham Street, Lower Upham Hampshire, SO32 1JA / GB Opponent's representative White, Martin Paul Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street GB-London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
02
21.09.2000
COHEN, Jacques 139, rue de Courlancy 51100 REIMS / FR Opponent's representative Becker, Philippe Cabinet Becker & Associés 10, rue de Milan 75009 Paris / FR | |||
03
22.09.2000
Novartis AG 4002 Basel / CH | 23.11.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.09.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.02.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/26] | Request for further processing for: | 12.11.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2559159 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR]) [X] 1,2 * example V *; | [XD]EP0243204 (CETUS CORP [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,11 * the whole document *; | [PX]FR2606030 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]) [PX] 1,2* page 8 - page 9 *; | [X] - J.G.IZANT ET AL., "Constitutive and conditional suppression of exogenous and endogenous genes by anti-sense RNA", SCIENCE, LANCASTER, PA US, (19850726), vol. 229, pages 345 - 352 [X] 1,2,7,10 * figure 1 * | [XD] - R.TELLIER ET AL., "New strategies for AIDS therapy and prophylaxis", NATURE, LONDON GB, (19851205), vol. 318, page 414 [XD] 1,2,7,10 * the whole document * | [X] - J.T.HOLT ET AL., "Inducible production of c-fos antisense RNA inhibits 3T3 cell proliferation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, vol. 83, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.83.13.4794, pages 4794 - 4798, XP002121078 [X] 1-3,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.83.13.4794 |