EP0765827 - Feeding and stacking device for plate-shaped pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIGMATECH MASCHINENBAU GmbH Ligmatech Strasse 1 D-09638 Lichtenberg / DE | [1997/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tönnigs, Bodo, Dipl.-Ing. Dorfstrasse 131 09638Lichtenberg / DE | 02 /
Kaden, Dietmar Dipl.-Ing. Alte Poststrasse 16B 09619 Mulda / DE | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Kohlmann, Karl Friedrich, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Kohlmann, Karl Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95115457.4 | 29.09.1995 | [1997/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0765827 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0765827 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/91, B65G61/00, B65G59/04 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
B65G47/914 (EP,US);
B65G59/045 (EP,US);
B65G61/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/14] | Title | German: | Beschick- oder Stapelvorrichtung für plattenförmige Werkstücke | [1997/14] | English: | Feeding and stacking device for plate-shaped pieces | [1997/14] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation et de stockage d'objets en forme de plaques | [1997/14] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.06.1999 | FR | 02.06.1999 | GB | 02.06.1999 | IT | 02.06.1999 | NL | 02.06.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 02.06.1999 | |
FR | 02.06.1999 | ||
GB | 02.06.1999 | ||
NL | 02.06.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 02.06.1999 | |
GB | 02.06.1999 | ||
NL | 02.06.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 02.06.1999 | |
GB | 02.06.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/05] | GB | 02.06.1999 | |
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | FR | 29.10.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2602622 (KASPAR KLAUS) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2337093 (BROLLO GIUSEPPE [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2000739 (THIBAULT J G A) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0467453 (CASAGRANDE TECHINT SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE4300565 (BARGSTEDT MASCHINEN UND ANLAGE [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0512126 |