13.05.2005 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |
28.01.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
06.07.2004 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
04.05.2004 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
18.12.2003 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
31.10.2003 |
Opposition filed |
published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] |
28.10.2003 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
24.10.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] |
06.12.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] |
13.11.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.02.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.10.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.01.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.11.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.06.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.06.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.05.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] |
15.01.1999 |
First examination report |
|
13.01.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.10.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.11.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] |
05.07.1996 |
Publication of search report |
published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] |
02.03.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] |