Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5769919 | 23.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US71148996 | 10.09.1996 | US32348094 | 14.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2939165B | Global Dossier | 25.08.1999 | B2 | JPH08183626 | 16.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US32348094 | 14.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0706978 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2003 | B1 | EP0706978 | 21.08.1996 | A3 | EP0706978 | 17.04.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32348094 | 14.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9504814 | 07.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US32348094 | 14.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2158603 | 13.07.1999 | C | CA2158603 | 15.04.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32348094 | 14.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ290682 | 11.09.2002 | B6 | CZ256495 | 14.08.1996 | A3 | Priority number | Date | US32348094 | 14.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69529448T | 23.10.2003 | T2 | DE69529448D1 | 27.02.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US32348094 | 14.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2191692T | 16.09.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US32348094 | 14.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI954560 | 15.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US32348094 | 14.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100268741B | 16.10.2000 | B1 | KR960014031 | 22.05.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US32348094 | 14.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL179531B | 29.09.2000 | B1 | PL310754 | 15.04.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32348094 | 14.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5669952 | 23.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US32348094 | 14.10.1994 |