EP0715130 - Air conditioner having frost preventing member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | ||
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Naohito 364, Sakata, Ooizumimachi Oura-gun, Gunma / JP | 02 /
Kamimura, Ichiro 1999-5, Azami, Kasakakemachi Nitta-gun, Gunma / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Yukiharu 1231-1, Yorikido Ooizumimachi Oura-gun, Gunma / JP | 04 /
Shimura, Kazuhiro 118-1, Akutu, Ojimamachi Nitta-gun, Gunma / JP | [1996/23] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95115644.7 | 04.10.1995 | [1996/23] | Priority number, date | JP19940295333 | 29.11.1994 Original published format: JP 29533394 | [1996/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0715130 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0715130 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0715130 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00, F25B9/00, F25B41/06 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
F25B9/006 (EP,US);
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/42 (EP,US);
F24F11/84 (EP,US);
F25B41/34 (EP,US);
F24F11/41 (EP,US);
F24F2140/00 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2513 (EP,US);
F25D21/04 (EP,US);
Y02B30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/23] | F24F11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/23] | Title | German: | Klimaanlage mit Mitteln zur Verhinderung von Eisbildung | [1996/23] | English: | Air conditioner having frost preventing member | [1996/23] | French: | Climatiseur avec des moyens empêchant la formation de givre | [1996/23] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 23.01.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4698981 (KANEKO TOMOMICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4879879 (MARSALA JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 15; figure 1 * | Examination | JPS613957 |