Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5925933 | 20.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US72956196 | 11.10.1996 | US33232894 | 31.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6110819 | 29.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US72956196 | 11.10.1996 | US31440899 | 19.05.1999 | US33232894 | 31.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0709887 | Global Dossier | 14.08.1996 | A3 | EP0709887 | 01.05.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US33232894 | 31.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5565707 | 15.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US33232894 | 31.10.1994 |