EP0709934 - Data transfer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Alfred Lettenstrasse 11 D-92422 Schwandorf / DE | 02 /
Wilhelm, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Otto-Carl-Schulz Str. 1 D-92224 Amberg / DE | [1996/18] | Application number, filing date | 95115951.6 | 10.10.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | DE19940017134U | 25.10.1994 Original published format: DE 9417134 U | [1996/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0709934 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0709934 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01R25/16, H02G3/12, H02B1/052 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
H02B1/205 (EP);
H01R25/14 (EP);
H01R12/714 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/18] | Title | German: | Datenübertragungssystem | [1996/18] | English: | Data transfer system | [1996/18] | French: | Système de transmission de données | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 24.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.12.1999 | [2008/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3732650 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]CH654696 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]FR2511197 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]); | [A]US3464052 (HUKIN ARTHUR SHEPHERD); | [A]FR2658008 (LEGRAND SA [FR]) |