EP0707111 - Alkenylsuccinic acid emulsion sizing agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/16] | Alkenylsuccinic acid emulsion sizing agent (2) | ||
[1998/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI OIL CO., LTD. 6-41, Konan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI OIL CO., LTD. 6-41, Konan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeda, Yasusuke, 309 Orenjihaimu Saginuma 17-1, Kodai 1-chome, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Kotsuka, Sadao 58-6, Shinkyo-cho, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Kouchi, Takeshi, CII-212 Guriin Hiru Fujigaoka 36-66, Fujigaoka 2-chome, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95116303.9 | 16.10.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | JP19940274325 | 14.10.1994 Original published format: JP 27432594 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707111 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707111 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/72, // (D21H17/16, 17:43, 17:60) | [1996/16] | CPC: |
D21H17/60 (EP,US);
C08F8/12 (EP,US);
C08F8/44 (EP,US);
D21H17/16 (EP,US);
D21H17/37 (EP,US);
D21H21/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/12, C08F8/46, C08F110/06 (US,EP);
C08F8/44, C08F8/12, C08F220/06 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1996/16] | Title | German: | Alkenylbernsteinsäureemulsion enthaltendes Leimungsmittel | [1996/16] | English: | Alkenylsuccinic acid emulsion sizing agent | [1998/30] | French: | Agent d'encollage comprenant une émulsion d'acide alkényl succinique | [1996/16] |
Former [1996/16] | Alkenylsuccinic acid emulsion sizing agent (2) | Examination procedure | 12.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 25.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4129507 (MARSHALL ROBERT M, et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [D]JPS6270479 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [A]EP0216297 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 7 - page 6, line 10 *; | [A]EP0468280 (MITSUBISHI OIL CO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1,3,5,6 * | by applicant | US3821069 | JPS58214598 | JPS6270479 |