EP0708190 - Actuator device for transmitting horizontal oscillatory movements to tube bars in knitting machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.1999 [1999/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zorini, Luigi Omodeo Via dei Mille 71 27024 Cilavegna (Pavia) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states Zorini, Luigi Omodeo Via dei Mille 71 I-27024 Cilavegna (Pavia) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Righetti, Giuseppe Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Righetti, Giuseppe Bugnion S.p.A. Via Carlo Farini, 81 I-20159 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95116404.5 | 26.06.1992 | [1996/17] | Priority number, date | IT1992MI00895 | 13.04.1992 Original published format: IT MI920895 | IT1991MI02439 | 16.09.1991 Original published format: IT MI912439 | [1996/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0708190 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0708190 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708190 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D04B27/26 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
D04B27/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [1996/17] | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtung zur Übertragung von horizontalen hin- und hergehenden Bewegungen zu Hülsentragbarren an Strickmaschinen | [1998/49] | English: | Actuator device for transmitting horizontal oscillatory movements to tube bars in knitting machines | [1996/17] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement pour la transmission de mouvements horizontaux oscillatoires aux barres des guide-fils dans des métiers à tricoter | [1998/49] |
Former [1996/17] | Antriebsvorrichtung zur Übertragung von horizontalen hin- und hergehenden Bewegungen zu Legebarren an Strickmaschinen | ||
Former [1996/17] | Dispositif d'entraînement pour la transmission de mouvements horizontaux oscillatoires aux barres à passettes dans des métiers à tricoter | Examination procedure | 29.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 01.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92830334.6 / EP0533630 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.12.1998 | [1999/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3950942 (NAMURA YUKIO, et al); | [A]US3978690 (BELING THOMAS E, et al); | [A]DE3034253 (ROCKWELL RIMOLDI SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 9 - line 36; figure 3 *; | [A]WO8903443 (LIBA MASCHF [DE], et al) [A] 1,3 * page 4, line 28 - page 10, line 8; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US3950942 |