EP0729776 - Device to drain away liquids from a separating container submitted to compressed air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [1998/42] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sheasby, Richard 7 Deronda Close Bedworth Warwickshire CV12 8QY / GB | [1996/36] | Application number, filing date | 95116533.1 | 20.10.1995 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | DE1995107232 | 02.03.1995 Original published format: DE 19507232 | [1996/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0729776 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729776 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B01D45/06, B01D53/26 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
B01D45/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Ableitung von Flüssigkeiten aus einem mit Druckluft beaufschlagbaren Abscheidebehälter | [1996/36] | English: | Device to drain away liquids from a separating container submitted to compressed air | [1996/36] | French: | Dispositif pour écouler des liquides d'un récipient de séparation soumis à l'air comprimé | [1999/06] |
Former [1996/36] | Dispositif pour écouler des liquides d'un récipient de séparation soumis à air comprimé | Examination procedure | 26.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 23.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3867115 (HEINTZELMAN LEO A) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US2944630 (ERIC HOERNER) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4848988 (SUZUKI HISAMOTO [JP]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US4234327 (WILLS BILL R) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9112871 (SULLAIR CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |