EP0769757 - Identification carrier for access and validation control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scheidt & Bachmann GmbH Breite Strasse 132 D-41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states SCHEIDT & BACHMANN GMBH Breite Strasse 132 D-41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr Norbert Miller Kampsheide 32 D - 41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95116624.8 | 21.10.1995 | [1997/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0769757 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/04, G06K19/07, G07F1/06, G07B15/04 | [1997/17] | CPC: |
G06K19/04 (EP);
G06K19/0723 (EP);
G06K19/07796 (EP);
G07B15/04 (EP);
G07F1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/17] | Title | German: | Identifikationsträger zur Zugangs- und Berechtigungskontrolle | [1997/17] | English: | Identification carrier for access and validation control | [1997/17] | French: | Porteur d'identification pour le contrôle d'accès et d'autorisation | [1997/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 27.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0613103 (PARKAUTOMATIC HANS FARMONT GMB [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6,7 * claims 1,10 *; | [Y]DE614999 (LUDWIG SCHOMBURG) [Y] 1-3,6,7 * claim 1 * | by applicant | DE4432649 | DE4335868 |