blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0710682

EP0710682 - Melamine formaldehyde impregnating resins for foils and edges [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2000/01]
Former [1996/19]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ott, Jürgen, Dr.
Stockwiesenweg 18
D-61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
02 / Schön, Manfred, Dr.
Humboldtstrasse 17
D-63110 Rodgau / DE
03 / Adam, Wilhelm, Dr.
Justus-von-Liebig-Strasse 21
D-63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE
04 / Scholl, Frank
Industriestrasse 2f
D-63543 Neuberg / DE
05 / Wolf, Alfons
Einhardstrasse 34
D-63500 Seligenstadt / DE
[1996/19]
Representative(s)Zounek, Nikolai
Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
[2008/43]
Former [2000/01]Zounek, Nikolai, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle Albert, Gebäude H287
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date95116709.724.10.1995
[1996/19]
Priority number, dateDE1994443915604.11.1994         Original published format: DE 4439156
[1996/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0710682
Date:08.05.1996
Language:DE
[1996/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0710682
Date:12.03.1997
[1997/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0710682
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.1997
ClassificationIPC:C08G12/30, C08G12/42, C08K5/3492, C08L61/26, C08L61/32, D06M15/423, D21H17/51
[1996/19]
CPC:
D21H17/51 (EP,US); C08G12/30 (EP,US); C08G12/42 (EP,US);
D06M15/423 (EP,US); D06M23/18 (EP,US); Y10T442/60 (EP,US);
Y10T442/659 (EP,US); Y10T442/674 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1996/19]
Extension statesSI24.11.1995
TitleGerman:Melamin-Formaldehyd-Tränkharze für Folien und Kanten[1996/19]
English:Melamine formaldehyde impregnating resins for foils and edges[1996/19]
French:Résines d'imprégnation mélamine-formaldéhyde pour feuilles et bords[1996/19]
Examination procedure24.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/36]
24.06.1997Request for accelerated examination filed
19.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.1997Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
21.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.1999Fee for grant paid
06.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchJPS4529516B  [ ];
 [X]GB867981  (MONSANTO CANADA LTD);
 [XY]DE1619243  (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH);
 [X]DE2655924  (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF);
 [A]EP0028204  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]);
 JPS59109344  [ ] (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO);
 [X]FR2586023  (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF [DE]);
 [DY]EP0268809  (CASSELLA FARBWERKE MAINKUR AG [DE]);
 JPH05202270  [ ] (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD);
 [X]EP0561432  (DSM NV [NL]);
by applicantDE2309334
 EP0268809
 EP0342386
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.