EP0716262 - Lighting fixture for linear lighting means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engel, Hartmut S. Monrepos Strasse 7 71634 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states Engel, Hartmut S. Monrepos Strasse 7 D-71634 Ludwigsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/24] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan B.Sc.(Phys.) Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95116878.0 | 26.10.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | DE19944443741 | 08.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4443741 | [1996/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0716262 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0716262 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/02, F21V7/09 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
F21V13/04 (EP,US);
F21V11/02 (EP,US);
F21V5/002 (EP,US);
F21V7/0016 (EP,US);
F21Y2103/00 (EP,US);
F21Y2113/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/24] | F21S3/02, F21V13/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/24] | Title | German: | Leuchte für langgestreckte Leuchtmittel | [1996/24] | English: | Lighting fixture for linear lighting means | [1996/24] | French: | Armature d'éclairage pour sources lumineuses linéaires | [1996/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.2001
ADMISSIBLE Siteco Beleuchtungstechnik GmbH Ohmstrasse 50 83301 Traunreut / DE Opponent's representative Schohe, Stefan, et al, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.2001
ADMISSIBLE Siteco Beleuchtungstechnik GmbH Ohmstrasse 50 83301 Traunreut / DE Opponent's representative Schohe, Stefan, et al, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | 28.11.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.07.2003 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/50] | Request for further processing for: | 13.09.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2001 | GB | 26.10.2001 | ES | 27.10.2001 | SE | 27.10.2001 | BE | 31.10.2001 | CH | 31.10.2001 | DK | 31.10.2001 | LI | 31.10.2001 | NL | 01.05.2002 | FR | 28.06.2002 | DE | 02.07.2002 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 26.10.2001 | |
GB | 26.10.2001 | ||
SE | 27.10.2001 | ||
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
DK | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 01.05.2002 | ||
FR | 28.06.2002 | ||
DE | 02.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/32] | AT | 26.10.2001 | |
GB | 26.10.2001 | ||
SE | 27.10.2001 | ||
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 01.05.2002 | ||
FR | 28.06.2002 | ||
DE | 02.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 26.10.2001 | |
GB | 26.10.2001 | ||
SE | 27.10.2001 | ||
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 01.05.2002 | ||
DE | 02.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | GB | 26.10.2001 | |
SE | 27.10.2001 | ||
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 01.05.2002 | ||
DE | 02.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | GB | 26.10.2001 | |
SE | 27.10.2001 | ||
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 01.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 26.10.2001 | |
SE | 27.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 01.05.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | SE | 27.10.2001 | |
NL | 01.05.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB531868 (THOMAS WILLETT ROLPH) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * page 2, line 34 - line 44 * * page 2, line 59 - line 89 * * page 2, line 96 - line 99 * * page 2, line 118 - line 121; figures 1,14,15 * [A] 7-10; | [A]FR1060308 (ERLENBACH) [A] 10 * page 1, column 1, line 23 - line 35 * * page 1, column 2, line 27 - line 30 ** page 1, column 2, line 38 - line 39; figures 3,5 *; | [A]DE3711366 (POHLSCHROEDER & CO KG [DE]) [A] 9 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0369338 (TRILUX LENZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 24 - line 31 * * column 5, line 33 - line 54; figure 4 *; | [YA]DE8513863U (DR.-ING. WILLING GMBH) [Y] 13 * page 2, line 13 - line 41; figures 1,2 * [A] 6; | [XY]DE4125545 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 13 |