EP0700698 - Ski with a system for influencing its stiffness by using hydraulic means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marker Deutschland GmbH Olympiastrasse 2 82438 Eschenlohe / DE | [1999/30] |
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states Marker Deutschland GmbH Olympiastrasse 2 D-82438 Eschenlohe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Premek, Stephanek Törlenstrasse 59 D-82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | 02 /
Lehner, Edwin Frickenstrasse 61 D-82490 Farchant / DE | 03 /
Wagner, Ludwig Schulstrasse 10 D-82490 Farchant / DE | 04 /
Ruffinengo, Piero G. 820 Edgehill Road Salt Lake City, UT84103 / US | [1996/11] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft Rotermund + Pfusch Waiblinger Strasse 11 D-70372 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117223.8 | 27.12.1991 | [1996/11] | Priority number, date | US19910715598 | 14.06.1991 Original published format: US 715598 | DE19900017486U | 27.12.1990 Original published format: DE 9017486 U | [1996/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0700698 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700698 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/07 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
A63C9/003 (EP,US);
A63C5/07 (EP,US);
A63C9/00 (EP,US);
A63C9/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR [1996/11] | Title | German: | Ski mit einem System zur Einstellung der Steifheit mittels Hydraulik | [1996/11] | English: | Ski with a system for influencing its stiffness by using hydraulic means | [1996/11] | French: | Ski avec un système pour influencer sa rigidité par moyens hydrauliques | [1996/11] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 17.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 22.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91122313.9 / EP0492658 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1603002 (WITTKE RUDOLF) [A] 1 * page 5, line 2 - line 10; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2433350 (SCHMIDT GUNTHER [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4577886 (CHERNEGA JOHN O [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO8805324 (FISCHER HERWIG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]FR1269049 (FERREZ) [A] 1 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE1578852 (MUTZHAS MAXIMILIAN F) [A] 1 * page 14, paragraph 1; figures 4-7 *; | [A]AT296109B (KOPP GERHARD) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0409749 | WO8303360 | US3937481 | AT373786B | DE2135450 | US4974867 |