EP0710989 - Field-effect transistor and method of producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-71 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-71 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohnishi, Toyokazu, c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-71 / JP | [1996/19] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1996/19] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117280.8 | 02.11.1995 | [1996/19] | Priority number, date | JP19940270893 | 04.11.1994 Original published format: JP 27089394 | [1996/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0710989 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0710989 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/423, H01L21/335, H01L29/08, H01L21/338 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
H01L29/66878 (EP,US);
H01L29/812 (KR);
H01L21/2815 (EP,US);
H01L21/28587 (EP,US);
H01L29/0891 (EP,US);
H01L29/42316 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/19] | H01L29/423, H01L21/335 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/19] | Title | German: | Feldeffekttransistor und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1996/19] | English: | Field-effect transistor and method of producing same | [1996/19] | French: | Transistor à effet de champ et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1996/19] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/47] | 14.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2230899 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4-11,13-17 * page 9, paragraphs 4-5; figures 1A-1G * [Y] 2,3,12; | [X]US4992387 (TAMURA AKIYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,4-11,13-17 * column 3, line 15 - line 30; figures 3-5 *; | [Y]US5147812 (GILBERT JAMES G [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,12 * column 5, line 9 - line 17; figure 6 *; | [A]US4729966 (KOSHINO YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 2,3 * column 3, line 8 - line 31; figure 2 * |