blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0716901

EP0716901 - Guiding device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2000
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.08.2000 [2000/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neff Antriebstechnik Automation GmbH
Bonholzstrasse 17
71111 Waldenbuch / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/25]For all designated states
Neff Antriebstechnik Automation GmbH
Bonholzstrasse 17
D-71111 Waldenbuch / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schön, Uwe
Bahnhofstrasse 32
D-71101 Schönaich / DE
[1996/25]
Representative(s)Rüger, Rudolf, et al
Webergasse 3
73728 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/25]Rüger, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing., et al
Webergasse 3
73728 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date95117293.103.11.1995
[1996/25]
Priority number, dateDE1994444513217.12.1994         Original published format: DE 4445132
[1996/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0716901
Date:19.06.1996
Language:DE
[1996/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0716901
Date:25.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.1996
ClassificationIPC:B23Q11/08, F15B15/08
[1996/25]
CPC:
B23Q11/085 (EP,US); F16C29/082 (EP,US); F16C29/12 (EP,US);
F16C2322/39 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/25]
TitleGerman:Führungseinrichtung[1996/25]
English:Guiding device[1996/25]
French:Dispositif de guidage[1996/25]
Examination procedure09.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/36]
03.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.02.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.05.1999Fee for grant paid
03.05.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]CH183271  (GENEVOISE INSTR PHYSIQUE [CH]) [A] 1 * page 1, column R, lines 7-20 *;
 [A]DE9006043U  (APK) [A] 1* page 3, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]JPH034005  (CKD CORP) [A] 1-9,13,16-18 * figures 1-6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.