EP0714908 - New 17-(3-imino-2-alkyl-propenyl)-5beta,14beta-androstane derivatives active on the cardiovascular system, processes for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIGMA-TAU Industrie Farmaceutiche Riunite S.p.A. Viale Shakespeare, 47 00144 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states Sigma-Tau Industrie Farmaceutiche Riunite S.p.A. Viale Shakespeare, 47 00144 Roma / IT | ||
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states Sigma-Tau Industrie Farmaceutiche Riunite S.p.A. Viale Shakespeare, 47 I-00144 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cerri, Alberto 7, Via Monte San Michele I-20060 Gessate (Milan) / IT | 02 /
Bianchi, Giuseppe 4, Piazza Adigrat I-20133 Milan / IT | 03 /
Ferrari, Patrizia 5, Via Gasparotto I-21100 Varese / IT | 04 /
Melloni, Piero 1, Via Centurelli I-20091 Bresso (Milan) / IT | 05 /
Quadri, Maria L. 11, Via C. Porta I-20063 Cernusco S/N (Milan) / IT | [1996/23] | Representative(s) | Fassi, Aldo, et al Hoffmann-Eitle & Partner, Patent-und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | Fassi, Aldo, et al Hoffmann-Eitle & Partner, Patent-und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117347.5 | 03.11.1995 | [1996/23] | Priority number, date | DE19944442486 | 29.11.1994 Original published format: DE 4442486 | [1996/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0714908 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0714908 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | [1996/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0714908 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07J41/00, A61K31/56, C07J43/00 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
C07J43/003 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07J41/0055 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/23] | C07J41/00, A61K31/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/23] | Title | German: | Neue 17-(3-Imino-2-alkyl-propenyl)-5beta-14beta-Androstanderivate, zur Behandlung von kardiovaskulären Erkrankungen, ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und pharmazeutische Präparate davon | [1996/23] | English: | New 17-(3-imino-2-alkyl-propenyl)-5beta,14beta-androstane derivatives active on the cardiovascular system, processes for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing same | [1996/23] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés 17-(3-imino-2-alkyl-propényle)-5beta,14beta-androstanes actifs sur le système cardiovasculaire, un procédé pour leur préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1996/23] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]EP0659761 (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI [IT]) [PA] 1-5 * whole document, in particular examples 1 and 13 *; | [E]EP0688786 (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI [IT]) [E] 1-4* example 22 *; | [A] - D. S. FULLERTON ET AL, "Cardenolide Analogues. I. A 17.beta.-Unsaturated Aldehyde", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (1976), vol. 19, no. 11, pages 1330 - 1333, XP002001296 [A] 1-5 * page 1331; table 1 * * page 1332; example 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00233a015 | [A] - R. HINTSCHE ET AL, "Biological potency and solution conformation of cardenolides determined by a new 1H NMR method", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY CHIMICA THERAPEUTICA., PARIS FR, (1985), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 9 - 15, XP002001297 [A] 1-5 * page 10; examples 5,7 * * page 14; table IV * | [A] - J. BOUTAGY ET AL, "Cardenolide Analogues. IV. Inhibition of Na+,K+-ATPase", AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1973), vol. NS2, no. 2, pages 41 - 46, XP002001298 [A] 1-5 * page 43; table I * * page 45, column 1, paragraph 3 * |