EP0709591 - Friction clutch release device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannesmann Sachs Aktiengesellschaft Ernst-Sachs-Strasse 62 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | [1998/16] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states FICHTEL & SACHS AG Ernst-Sachs-Strasse 62 D-97424 Schweinfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mischler, Manfred Judenstrasse 6 D-97447 Frankenwinheim / DE | 02 /
Müller, Roland Raiffeisenstr. 12 D-97505 Geldersheim / DE | 03 /
Riese, Hans-Walter Hermann-Löns-Str. 6 D-97525 Schwebheim / DE | 04 /
Müller, Karl Steinleite 17 D-97490 Poppenhausen / DE | 05 /
Stürmer, Winfried An den Schwalgen 29 D-97502 Euerbach / DE | 06 /
Husse, Ulrich Sperlingstr. 38 D-97422 Schweinfurt / DE | [1999/48] |
Former [1996/18] | 01 /
Mischler, Manfred Judenstrasse 6 D-97447 Frankenwinheim / DE | ||
02 /
Müller, Roland Raiffeisenstr. 12 D-97505 Geldersheim / DE | |||
03 /
Riese, Hans-Walter Hermann-Löns-Str. 6 D-67525 Schwebheim / DE | |||
04 /
Müller, Karl Steinleite 17 D-97490 Poppenhausen / DE | |||
05 /
Stürmer, Winfried An den Schwalgen 29 D-97502 Euerbach / DE | |||
06 /
Husse, Ulrich Sperlingstr. 38 D-97422 Schweinfurt / DE | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann,K. Fincke,F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber,H. Liska,J. Prechtel,B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117531.4 | 06.04.1993 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | DE19924211476 | 06.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4211476 | DE19924211477 | 06.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4211477 | DE19924211478 | 06.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4211478 | DE19934303489 | 06.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4303489 | [1996/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0709591 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0709591 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | [1996/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0709591 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/14 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
F16D23/146 (EP);
F16D2013/706 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/18] | Title | German: | Ausrückeranordnung für eine Kraftfahrzeug-Reibungskupplung | [1996/18] | English: | Friction clutch release device | [1996/18] | French: | Butée pour embrayage à friction | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 12.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93105700.4 / EP0565063 | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]GB2259345 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [PA] 1,7,8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0153087 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD PLC [GB]) [A] 1,7,13 * column W *; | [DA]GB2138095 (VALEO) [DA] 1,21 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2539473 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 8,27 * page 13; figure 7 *; | [DA]FR2622265 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD FRANCE [FR]) [DA] 1 * page 6; figure 6 *; | [A]FR2629882 (VALEO [FR]); | [A]FR834298 (GEN MOTORS CORP) | by applicant | DE3537788 | DE3919943 | DE3919944 | GB2138095 | FR2622265 |