blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0711994

EP0711994 - Device and method for illuminating an object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/20]Illumination devices
[2004/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, Texas 75265 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/20]For all designated states
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas Texas 75265 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Anderson, Charles H.
8741 Charing Cross Lane
Dallas, TX 75243 / US
[1996/20]
Representative(s)Degwert, Hartmut, et al
Prinz & Partner
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Degwert, Hartmut, et al
Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2003/12]Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Former [1996/20]Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing.
Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7
D-81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date95117682.509.11.1995
[1996/20]
Priority number, dateUS1994033758810.11.1994         Original published format: US 337588
[1996/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0711994
Date:15.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0711994
Date:02.07.1997
[1997/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0711994
Date:02.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.1997
ClassificationIPC:G01N21/88
[1996/20]
CPC:
G01N21/8806 (EP,KR,US); G01N21/956 (EP,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/20]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Beleuchtung eines Gegenstandes[2004/41]
English:Device and method for illuminating an object[2004/41]
French:Dispositif et procédé pour illuminer un objet[2004/41]
Former [1996/20]Beleuchtungsvorrichtungen
Former [1996/20]Illumination devices
Former [1996/20]Dispositifs d'éclairement
Examination procedure16.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/07]
30.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
04.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2004Fee for grant paid
07.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08]
Request for further processing for:18.03.2004Request for further processing filed
18.03.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.04.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
26.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT02.03.2005
NL02.03.2005
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]NL02.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5051872  (ANDERSON CHARLES H [US]) [AD] 1,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 46 *;
 [A]US4729079  (MAYLOTTE DONALD H [US]) [A] 1,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 47 *;
 [A]JPS5870150  ;
 [A]US5201576  (SQUYRES HENRY P [US]) [A] 1,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 55 *;
 [A]US3712979  (PADGITT H) [A] 1,13 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 41 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830714), vol. 7, no. 160, Database accession no. (P - 210)<1305> , & JP58070150 A 19830426 (FUJI DENKI SEIZO K.K.) [A] 1,13 * abstract *
by applicantUS5051872
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.