EP0716370 - A disk access method for delivering multimedia and video information on demand over wide area networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kouloheris, Jack L. 42 Old Farm Lane Mohegan, New York 10547 / US | 02 /
Kumar, Manoj 2H Overlook Commons Yorktown Heights, New York 10598 / US | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Teufel, Fritz, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1996/24] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin, Dipl.-Phys. IBM Deutschland, Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117739.3 | 10.11.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | US19940350364 | 06.12.1994 Original published format: US 350364 | [1996/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0716370 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0716370 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, H04N7/173 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
H04N21/2326 (EP,US);
G06F3/06 (KR);
G06F3/0613 (EP,US);
G06F3/0659 (EP,US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US);
G06F3/0689 (EP,US);
H04N7/17336 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/24] | Title | German: | Ein Plattenzugangsverfahren, um Multimedia- und Videoinformation auf Wunsch über Grossraumnetze zu liefern | [1996/24] | English: | A disk access method for delivering multimedia and video information on demand over wide area networks | [1996/24] | French: | Méthode d'accès de disque pour délivrer une information de type multimédia et vidéo à la demande sur des réseaux étendus | [1996/24] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/06] | 23.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 18.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9412937 (STARLIGHT NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1-4,6-12 * page 1, line 1 - line 15 * * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 16 * * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 17 * * figures 4a-5; claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0573308 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - line 58 * * column 13, line 37 - column 15, line 20 *; | [PA]WO9429796 (NETWORK APPLIANCE CORP [US]) [PA] 1-3,6-12 * page 3, line 1 - line 13 * * page 6, line 10 - line 18 * * page 11, line 17 - page 12, line 3 * * figures 1,10 *; | [Y] - KEETON K ET AL, "STORAGE ALTERNATIVES FOR VIDEO SERVICE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON MASS STORAGE SYSTEMS. TOWARDS DISTRIBUTED STORAGE AND DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS. ANNECY, JUNE 12 - 16, 1994, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19940612), vol. SYMP. 13, ISBN 0-8186-5582-8, pages 100 - 105, XP000493024 [Y] 1-4,6,7,10-12 * page 102, column L, line 1 - line 16 * * page 101, column L, line 37 - line 53 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MASS.1994.373040 | [Y] - LOUGHER P ET AL, "THE IMPACT OF DIGITAL AUDIO AND VIDEO ON HIGH-SPEED STORAGE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON MASS STORAGE SYSTEMS. TOWARDS DISTRIBUTED STORAGE AND DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS. ANNECY, JUNE 12 - 16, 1994, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19940612), vol. SYMP. 13, ISBN 0-8186-5582-8, pages 84 - 89, XP000493022 [Y] 1-4,6,7,10-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MASS.1994.373037 | [A] - CHANG E ET AL, "Variable bit rate MPEG video storage on parallel disk arrays", COMMUNITY NETWORKING INTEGRATED MULTIMEDIA SERVICES TO THE HOME, 1994., PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1ST INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 13-14 JULY 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940713), ISBN 0-7803-2076-X, pages 127 - 137, XP010124398 [A] 1,4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CN.1994.337356 | [DA] - CHEN P M ET AL, "RAID: HIGH-PERFORMANCE, RELIABLE SECONDARY STORAGE", ACM COMPUTING SURVEYS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19940601), vol. 26, no. 2, ISSN 0360-0300, pages 145 - 185, XP000672139 [DA] 1-12 * page 146, column R, line 51 - page 147, column L, line 1 * * page 151 - page 152, paragraph 3.1 * * page 171, column R, paragraph 4.4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/176979.176981 | [PA] - TOBAGI F ET AL, "STREAMING RAID- A DISK ARRAY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR VIDEO FILES", COMPUTER TECHNOLOGY REVIEW, WESTWORLD PRODUCTION CO. LOS ANGELES, US, (19941221), ISSN 0278-9647, pages 66,68,81 - 83, XP000429677 [PA] 1 | by applicant | US5148432 | US5163131 | - KEETON ET AL., "Storage Alternatives for Video Service", PROCEEDINGS ON 13THE IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON MASS STORAGE SYSTEMS, (19940612), doi:doi:10.1109/MASS.1994.373040, pages 100 - 105, XP000493024 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MASS.1994.373040 |