EP0712884 - High viscosity surfactants for the manufacture of polyurethane foams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROMPTON CORPORATION 199 Benson Road Middlebury, Connecticut 06749 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Crompton Corporation 199 Benson Road Middlebury, Connecticut 06749 / US | ||
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states CROMPTON CORPORATION One American Lane Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US | ||
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states CK WITCO CORPORATION One American Lane Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US | ||
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states WITCO CORPORATION One American Lane Greenwich, Connecticut 06831-2559 / US | ||
Former [1996/21] | For all designated states OSI SPECIALTIES, INC. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road, Silicones Building Tarrytown, NY 10591-6728 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Glenn A. 2225 West Washington Street Charleston, W.V. 25312 / US | 02 /
Kirchner, David L. 2515 Woodland Avenue South Charleston, W.V. 25303 / US | 03 /
McVey, Susan B. 918 Ridgeway Road Charleston, W.V. 25314 / US | [1996/21] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/21] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117814.4 | 10.11.1995 | [1996/21] | Priority number, date | US19940340980 | 17.11.1994 Original published format: US 340980 | [1996/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0712884 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0712884 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0712884 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, C08G77/46, C08L83/12 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
C08G77/46 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/21] | C08J9/00, C08G77/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/21] | Title | German: | Hochviskose Oberflächenaktive Mittel zur Herstellung von Polyurethanschäume | [1996/21] | English: | High viscosity surfactants for the manufacture of polyurethane foams | [1996/21] | French: | Agents tensioactifs à haute viscosité pour la fabrication de mousses de polyuréthane | [1996/21] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 10.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2003 | ES | 15.09.2003 | [2004/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0193815 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0275563 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1-12 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0493836 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [A] 1* &US-A-5145879(D);; claim 1 * | by applicant | US3890414 | US3980688 | US4147847 | US4855379 | US5145879 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 9082-00-2 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 3033-62-3 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 110-98-5 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 33125-86-9 | - JONES AND FESMAN, J. CELLULAR PLASTICS, (1965), vol. 1, pages 3 - 19 | US19930101189 |