EP0714992 - Method for increased yield when chlorinating titaniferous materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.1999 [1999/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONOS TITAN-GmbH Peschstrasse 5 D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | [1996/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartmann, Achim, Dipl.-Ing. Lucas Cranach-Strasse 18 D-50259 Pulheim / DE | [1998/16] |
Former [1996/23] | 01 /
Hartmann, Achim, Dipl.-Ing. Lucas-Cranach-Strasse 18 D-50259 Pulheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117885.4 | 14.11.1995 | [1996/23] | Priority number, date | DE19944442783 | 01.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4442783 | [1996/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0714992 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0714992 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C22B34/12 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
C22B34/1222 (EP,US);
C22B34/1231 (EP,US);
C22B34/1259 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, NL [1996/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erhöhen der Ausbeute bei der Chlorierung titanhaltiger Rohstoffe | [1996/23] | English: | Method for increased yield when chlorinating titaniferous materials | [1996/23] | French: | Procédé pour augmenter le rendement pour la chloruration de matériaux titanifères | [1996/23] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0318231 (EXTRACT INC [US]) [AD] 1 * claim - *; | [A]WO8700826 (SCM CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US4435365 (MORRIS ALAN J [US]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]GB776295 (DU PONT) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [A]GB2059786 (V N I PI TITANA, et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US4854972 (GARRIDO GUILLERMO F [CA], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]DE2612804 (ISHIHARA MINING & CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1 * claim - * | by applicant | EP0318231 |