EP0718956 - Sealed rotation angle measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/26] | Rotation angle measuring device | ||
[1998/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX STEGMANN GmbH ANTRIEBSTECHNIK - ELEKTRONIK Dürrheimer Strasse 36 D-78166 Donaueschingen / DE | [1998/20] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states MAX STEGMANN Gmbh ANTRIEBSTECHNIK - ELEKTRONIK Dürrheimer Strasse 36 D-78166 Donaueschingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siraky, Josef Brigachtalstrasse 31 D-78166 Donaueschingen / DE | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Buchner, Mussgnug Neunert, Göhring Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117898.7 | 14.11.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | DE19944446243 | 23.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4446243 | [1996/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718956 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718956 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/10, H02K5/124, H02K7/20 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
G01D11/245 (EP,US);
H02K5/10 (EP,US);
H02K7/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/26] | H02K5/124, H02K7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/26] | Title | German: | Abgedichtete Drehwinkel-Messvorrichtung | [1998/20] | English: | Sealed rotation angle measuring device | [1998/20] | French: | Dispositif étanche de mesure de l'angle de rotation | [1998/20] |
Former [1996/26] | Drehwinkel-Messvorrichtung | ||
Former [1996/26] | Rotation angle measuring device | ||
Former [1996/26] | Dispositif de mesure de l'angle de rotation | Examination procedure | 26.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 01.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.05.1998 | NL | 13.05.1998 | SE | 13.08.1998 | AT | 14.11.1998 | IE | 11.12.1998 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 13.05.1998 | |
SE | 13.08.1998 | ||
AT | 14.11.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | SE | 13.08.1998 | |
AT | 14.11.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/24] | IE | 13.05.1998 | |
SE | 13.08.1998 | ||
AT | 14.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | IE | 13.05.1998 | |
SE | 13.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | SE | 13.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05147868 ; | [A]JPS62207153 ; | [A]JPS5514938 ; | [A]GB2117572 (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930929), vol. 017, no. 541, Database accession no. (M - 1488), & JP05147868 A 19930615 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880227), vol. 012, no. 065, Database accession no. (E - 586), & JP62207153 A 19870911 (TAMAGAWA SEIKI KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800409), vol. 004, no. 045, Database accession no. (M - 006), & JP55014938 A 19800201 (TSURUMI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3301295 |