EP0722225 - Audio signal coding through short time spectra and a psychoacoustical model [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 D-78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vaupel, Thomas Leggewiesstr. 23 D-45359 Essen / DE | 02 /
Lehmann, Siegfried Neckarstr. 62 D-45219 Essen / DE | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1996/29] | Hartnack, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patentabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117924.1 | 14.11.1995 | [1996/29] | Priority number, date | DE19944441032 | 17.11.1994 Original published format: DE 4441032 | [1996/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0722225 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0722225 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/66 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
H04B1/665 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/29] | Title | German: | Audiosignalkodierung mittels Kurzzeitspektren und einem psychoakustischen Modell | [1996/29] | English: | Audio signal coding through short time spectra and a psychoacoustical model | [1996/29] | French: | Codage de signaux audio utilisant des spectres de courte durée et un modèle psycho-acoustique | [1996/29] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 30.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/34] | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5301255 (NAGAI KIYOTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 45 - line 68 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 15 *; | [PX]WO9502929 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US]) [PX] 1,5 * page 4, line 22 - line 27 ** page 6, line 17 - line 25 * |