EP0713838 - Device and method for monitoring the thread reserve in weft feeders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/22] | Improved device and method for monitoring the thread reserve in weft feeders | ||
[1998/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L.G.L. ELECTRONICS S.p.A. Via Tasca 3 I-24100 Bergamo / IT | [1996/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zenoni, Pietro Via Monte Grappa, 3 I-24026 Leffe / IT | 02 /
Gotti, Luca Via Palma il Vecchio, 6 I-24021 Albino / IT | [1996/22] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95118216.1 | 20.11.1995 | [1996/22] | Priority number, date | IT1994TO00935 | 22.11.1994 Original published format: IT TO940935 | [1996/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0713838 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0713838 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | [1997/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0713838 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65H51/22 | [1996/22] | CPC: |
D03D47/367 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, LI, SE [1996/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Überwachung der Fadenreserve in Schussfadenliefervorrichtungen | [1996/22] | English: | Device and method for monitoring the thread reserve in weft feeders | [1998/36] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour surveiller la réserve de fil dans des fournisseurs de trame | [1996/22] |
Former [1996/22] | Improved device and method for monitoring the thread reserve in weft feeders | Examination procedure | 16.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 03.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 09.06.1999 | [2002/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0094099 (IRO AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,6-10 * page 11, line 9 - page 13, line 16; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]EP0171516 (IRO AB [SE]) [AD] 1,6 * page 12, line 3 - line 9 * * page 18, line 20 - page 21, line 25; figures 1,9A-11C *; | [A]EP0327973 (ROY ELECTROTEX SPA [IT]) [A] 1,6-10* column 7, line 36 - column 8, line 23; figures 1,7 *; | [A]EP0464444 (SOBREVIN [LI]) [A] 1,2,4,6 * column 10, line 30 - column 11, line 58; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | EP0171516 |